Governing document THE PRIORY FOR WALES OF THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN OF JERUSALEM
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND PROMOTION OF ALL WORKS OF HUMANITY AND CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN SICKNESS, DISTRESS, SUFFERING AND DANGER, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, CLASS, OR CREED.
Area of benefit
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.