Financial history ALEXANDERS DISCOUNT COMPANY LIMITED CLERKS WIDOWS AND CHILDRENS FUND

Charity number: 251050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £946 £965 £985 £1.00k £1.02k
Total expenditure £952 £952 £1.93k £1.93k £1.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A