Financial history QUEEN ELIZABETH'S FOUNDATION FOR DISABLED PEOPLE

Charity number: 251051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.03m £10.73m £11.68m £12.42m £14.43m
Total expenditure £12.59m £10.99m £10.99m £11.85m £13.44m
Income from government contracts £4.64m £5.08m £4.07m £3.27m £3.22m
Income from government grants £456.00k £480.27k £1.29m £590.15k £563.34k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.21m £2.46m £2.35m £2.21m £2.72m
Income - Other trading activities £1.46m £1.45m £1.46m £2.40m £2.62m
Income - Charitable activities £6.11m £6.78m £6.81m £7.74m £9.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.00k £9.00k £2.00k £4.00k £11.00k
Income - Other £241.00k £30.00k £1.05m £62.00k £65.00k
Income - Legacies £658.00k £872.00k £436.00k £662.00k £799.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.90m £8.47m £8.26m £8.62m £10.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.69m £1.10m £1.28m £3.23m £3.37m
Expenditure - Governance £45.00k £33.00k £37.56k £40.77k £36.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.42m £1.44m £0 £0