THE LONDON SCOTTISH HEADQUARTERS TRUST (THE HEADQUARTERS TRUST)

Charity number: 251499
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £180.57k £186.30k £163.14k £292.76k £632.74k
Total expenditure £178.10k £143.68k £32.46k £371.44k £633.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £140.00k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £601.20k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.94k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.60k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £525.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £108.14k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0