PENYBANC WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 251632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £35.94k £8.62k £13.26k £19.67k £8.18k
Total expenditure £7.82k £4.80k £4.50k £23.25k £7.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.13k N/A £6.44k N/A N/A