Financial history TIFERETH BENEVOLENT FUND LIMITED

Charity number: 251737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £27.68k £27.17k £21.90k £14.14k £188.08k
Total expenditure £17.85k £12.50k £43.42k £5.63k £113.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A