Governing document NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR HOUSING AND PLANNING
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCOPORATED 21/5/1951 AS AMENDED 3/7/1969, 29/10/1970, 11/10/1979, 30/10/1980, 15/10/1981, 22/4/1985, 2/11/1989,& 22/10/1992
Charitable objects
A) THE GENERAL IMPROVEMENT AND AMELIORATION OF THE HOUSING CONDITIONS OF THE POORER CLASSES OF THE PUBLIC OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO SECURE BY ALL POSSIBLE MEANS THE ABOLITION OF UNHEALTHY AND UNDESIRABLE HOUSING CONDITIONS. B) TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING. C) TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN EDUCATIONIN RELATION TO THE BUILDING DECORATING DESIGNING AND EQUIPPING OF HOUSES AND OTHER BUILDINGS AND IN RELATION TO THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.