CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 252200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 April 2021 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 April 2021 163 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 April 2021 526 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 April 2021 526 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 March 2021 882 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 March 2021 882 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 March 2021 1247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 March 2021 1247 days late Download