CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 252200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £35.92k £45.82k £43.63k £72.85k £39.56k
Total expenditure £49.25k £48.71k £47.34k £72.85k £22.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A