THE COMMUNITY TRUST OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY

Charity number: 252222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £61.00k £63.95k £62.77k £65.74k £64.44k
Total expenditure £63.00k £61.48k £65.81k £58.12k £72.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A