ALLANDALE CARE GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 252624
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 15 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 29 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 12 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 29 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 24 March 2017 On time Download