ALLANDALE CARE GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 252624
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robin Hughes Trustee 24 July 2017 None on record
Professor Michael Riley Trustee 27 July 2016 None on record
JAYNE HENNESSEY Trustee 04 January 2021 None on record
CARL HOWELL Trustee 16 December 2020 None on record
Dr Elizabeth Anne Cooper Trustee 12 July 2021 None on record
Kevin Morris Trustee 02 September 2016 None on record
ERIC SMETHURST MBA FCCA Trustee None on record
Lynn Pierce Trustee 24 March 2021 None on record