ST STEPHENS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 253170
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £43.99k £31.28k £34.79k £32.70k £30.31k
Total expenditure £47.11k £38.24k £39.78k £31.90k £26.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.40k £1.90k £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k