Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH BISHOP'S STORTFORD

Charity number: 253376
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.01k £6.10k £4.62k £2.77k £1.87k
Total expenditure £1.68k £6.60k £11.72k £448 £20.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A