Financial history BRITISH-ITALIAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 253386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £69.69k £61.48k £20.97k £17.29k £20.30k
Total expenditure £68.04k £45.39k £31.32k £19.47k £25.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A