Financial history THE REVEREND JAMES WEBB MILLS FOR THE AUGMENTATION OF THE BENEFICE OF KEDINGTON

Charity number: 253508
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £1.23k £1.27k £1.30k £1.31k £1.33k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A