Trustees NATIONAL DAHLIA SOCIETY
Charity number: 254049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Alexander Gillam | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hill McFarlane | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Louise Appleby | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sutherland | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles McCormick | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David William Hall | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Howell | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Boulstridge | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nute | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Craig Robinson | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cyril Watkins | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ledger | Trustee | 09 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Brown | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RON THOMAS | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Bates | Trustee | 12 March 1990 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANGUS REID | Trustee |
|
||||||
MIKE CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUNE NASH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RON GUEST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.