Financial history EVANGELICAL PRESS AND SERVICES LIMITED

Charity number: 254335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £262.90k £234.96k £287.57k £325.85k £235.47k
Total expenditure £253.75k £231.58k £278.76k £295.19k £215.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A