WILLIAM WHITTINGTON

Charity number: 254406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 February 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required