STREATHAM DARBY AND JOAN CLUB

Charity number: 254702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 August 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 March 2020 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 August 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required