Accounts and annual returns CHEDGRAVE COMMON

Charity number: 255453
Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required