STAMFORD ST GEORGE CHURCH ESTATE

Charity number: 255620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required