STAMFORD ST GEORGE CHURCH ESTATE

Charity number: 255620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.34k £2.56k £2.58k £1.98k £3.32k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £6.30k £10.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A