CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, MAIDSTONE

Charity number: 255941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £30.78k £33.10k £57.65k £35.59k £29.35k
Total expenditure £26.92k £21.52k £23.55k £21.77k £23.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A