Financial history BOTANICAL RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 255950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.67k £1.71k £2.26k £2.30k £2.32k
Total expenditure £2.76k £3.03k £2.56k £1.80k £980
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A