Financial history ST. BARNABAS HOSPICES (SUSSEX) LTD

Charity number: 256789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.13m £19.02m £18.50m £17.00m £20.00m
Total expenditure £15.46m £17.27m £19.31m £20.20m £18.48m
Income from government contracts £2.35m £774.00k £2.56m £960.00k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.57m £2.56m £2.52m £7.70m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.83m £10.04m £9.17m £7.55m £7.15m
Income - Other trading activities £8.28m £8.27m £5.81m £5.96m £4.38m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £2.64m £2.64m £7.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £4.22m £0 £0
Income - Investment £616.00k £663.00k £791.00k £779.00k £724.00k
Income - Other £53.00k £53.00k £83.00k £58.00k £14.00k
Income - Legacies £5.44m £6.30m £4.95m £3.71m £2.82m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.62m £11.99m £13.19m £13.60m £13.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.84m £5.28m £6.12m £6.59m £4.22m
Expenditure - Governance £548.00k £19.00k £415.00k £0 £19.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £421.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £749.00k