WOMEN'S INSTITUTE WOODMANCOTE

Charity number: 256941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 11 September 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 16 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required