Accounts and annual returns HAWKES NEST CHARITY

Charity number: 257066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required