Financial history HAWKES NEST CHARITY

Charity number: 257066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.37k £2.53k £2.49k £2.55k £2.60k
Total expenditure £2.45k £3.00k £3.34k £3.05k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A