MANCHESTER JEWISH COMMUNITY CARE

Charity number: 257238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 04 July 2016 On time Download