Accounts and annual returns ST ANDREW'S PARISH HALL TRUST

Charity number: 257730
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required