ROTARY CLUB OF HENLEY-ON-THAMES BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 258088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £16.78k £20.60k £23.84k £13.94k £13.16k
Total expenditure £11.37k £21.51k £15.08k £13.99k £11.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A