THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 258097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required