Financial history ROBERT WATCHORN TRUST

Charity number: 258369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £21.20k £43.47k £20.57k £202.45k £10.24k
Total expenditure £47.26k £42.52k £20.05k £208.33k £6.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A