Financial history WEST EALING TRUST

Charity number: 258380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.41k £13.14k £12.24k £12.44k £10.54k
Total expenditure £14.11k £10.17k £4.27k £60 £60
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A