Financial history THE FRIENDS OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 258735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.03k £7.38k £8.52k £9.13k £3.59k
Total expenditure £3.12k £7.08k £4.16k £5.87k £6.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A