Trustees THE FRIENDS OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 258735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Charles Scott Trustee 23 April 2022
None on record
Erica Connolly Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Raymond Ernest Appleby Trustee 04 September 2021
None on record
Pamela Christine Evennett Trustee 05 December 2020
None on record
Alan Clarke Trustee 04 May 2019
THE SID VALE ASSOCIATION CIO
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH ST GILES & ST NICHOLAS
Received: On time
Margaret Jewes Trustee 04 May 2019
None on record
Barbara Anne Allan Trustee 04 May 2019
None on record
Margaret Elisabeth Moss Trustee 04 May 2019
None on record
Cynthia Anne Scott Trustee 04 May 2019
None on record
Michael James Ellingham Trustee 22 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH ST GILES & ST NICHOLAS
Received: On time
SUSAN BYRD Trustee 06 May 2017
THE ROWLAND TRUST
Received: On time