Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BEDFORDSHIRE SOUTH BRANCH
Charity number: 259020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Byrne | Chair | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prashant Thakkar | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Rice | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Carignan | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Stratton | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Christina Robinson | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Herta Grell | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Thomas Hooper | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Francis | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.