Financial history NORTHERN BALLET LIMITED

Charity number: 259140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.82m £9.18m £8.41m £8.74m £8.58m
Total expenditure £9.45m £9.68m £10.19m £6.50m £8.91m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.60m £3.94m £3.72m £2.66m £4.32m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.27m £4.87m £4.98m £5.60m £5.75m
Income - Other trading activities £1.06m £1.17m £794.85k £315.98k £246.47k
Income - Charitable activities £3.93m £3.14m £2.63m £2.31m £1.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.13k £1.86k £4.82k £0 £859
Income - Other £550.45k £0 £0 £514.96k £1.02m
Income - Legacies £5.00k £8.36k £104.00k £110.00k £34.97k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.73m £8.95m £9.36m £5.58m £7.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £704.53k £730.57k £826.32k £921.38k £987.16k
Expenditure - Governance £60.04k £61.30k £27.50k £32.50k £37.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £14.01k £0 £0 £0 £0