LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SHEFFIELD TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 259596
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)