Trustees LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SHEFFIELD TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Charity number: 259596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DORIS STOW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kehinde Obemeata | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||
SARAH button | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Toffolo | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Betty Lorraine Etherton | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Presley | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.