Accounts and annual returns THE KENNEDY TRUST FOR RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH

Charity number: 260059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 24 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 22 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window