Accounts and annual returns DANBY WISKE VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 260547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window