THE CONGREGATIONAL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 260601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 November 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 November 2020 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download