SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 260615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADRIAN PERRY Trustee 14 March 2018 None on record
CHRISTINE HEPWORTH Trustee None on record
JACKIE ROBERTS Trustee 09 March 2010 None on record
GLEN BRIDGEWOOD Trustee 11 March 2014 None on record
Paul Riley Trustee 10 May 2017 None on record
MICHAEL DAVID WAINWRIGHT Trustee 25 March 2013 None on record