SOUTHWARK AND LAMBETH ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 260745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.87k £2.20k £490 £1.09k £249
Total expenditure £1.91k £2.27k £579 £2.15k £380
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A