THE INTIMATE OPERA CLUB (ELTHAM)

Charity number: 260755
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 184 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 184 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 March 2021 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 08 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required