THE INTIMATE OPERA CLUB (ELTHAM)

Charity number: 260755
Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £6.03k £6.86k £5.01k £4.47k £3.17k
Total expenditure £5.84k £5.87k £6.54k £5.28k £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A