THE CHARITABLE AND BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE ROTARY CLUB OF UCKFIELD

Charity number: 260888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £13.77k £12.09k £10.17k £9.96k £17.57k
Total expenditure £11.75k £301 £7.20k £12.15k £18.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A