Trustees WELL CREEK TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 261020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAME ALFRED SEATON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Mather | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paulette Louise Nuss | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JETSON | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HUGH SCOTT | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Kelly | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEO DELANEY | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN GULLON | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ADAMS | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEN LAMBARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DICK GODFREY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.